Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Warrants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 /CH0131
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 (SB0109)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Warrant Intercept Program - Termination Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 (SB0551)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 (SB0341)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0779)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0833)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051
Title
Charles County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0925)
Title
Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 (HB0115)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Warrant Intercept Program - Termination Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 (HB0280)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0011)
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0263)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB0839)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB0977)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 (HB1267)
Title
Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 /CH0131 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0115 (SB0109) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Warrant Intercept Program - Termination Repeal Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Information on Judge or Magistrate Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 (SB0551) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0280 (SB0341) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0839 (SB0779) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0977 (SB0833) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1051 Charles County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1218 Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1267 (SB0925) Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 (HB0115) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Warrant Intercept Program - Termination Repeal Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0341 (HB0280) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0011) Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0263) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0779 (HB0839) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0833 (HB0977) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0925 (HB1267) Licensing and Registration - Unpaid Fines or Failure to Appear - Penalties Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM