Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Warranties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 (SB0379)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 (SB0380)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0258
Title
Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 (HB0068)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0069)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 (SB0379) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0069 (SB0380) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0698 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0247 /CH0258 Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 (HB0068) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0380 (HB0069) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM