Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington Suburban Sanitary District

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 /CH0161
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0162
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0163
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0164
Title
Property Tax Credits – Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police Officers and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Officers MC/PG 108–19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 (SB0202)
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 /CH0563
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 (HB0647)
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0324 /CH0161 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0325 /CH0162 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 /CH0163 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 /CH0164 Property Tax Credits – Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police Officers and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Officers MC/PG 108–19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 (SB0202) Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0674 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1280 /CH0563 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 (HB0647) Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM