Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weather

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0415
Title
Coast Smart Council
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Winter Driving Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1503
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0127
Title
Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196
Title
Workers' Compensation - Volunteer Canteen and Rehabilitation Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Required Notices
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0615 /CH0415 Coast Smart Council Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Winter Driving Safety Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1503 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0127 Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 Workers' Compensation - Volunteer Canteen and Rehabilitation Personnel Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0887 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1060 Homeowner's Insurance - Required Notices Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM