Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weather

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0319
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0491
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 (SB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 (SB0920)
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 /CH0318
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB1284)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0796)
Title
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 (HB1482)
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 /CH0319 Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Economic Matters
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 /CH0491 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - Deductibles Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0801) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1284 (SB0627) Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1482 (SB0920) Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0245 /CH0318 Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Finance
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0627 (HB1284) Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0796) Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0920 (HB1482) Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM