Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Home Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 (SB0812)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 (SB0798)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1337)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB0550)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1105
Title
Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0366 Home Act of 2014 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0550 (SB0812) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014 Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 (SB0798) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0021 Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0798 (HB1337) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0812 (HB0550) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1105 Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM