Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0513)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Home Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 /CH0287
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 (SB0894)
Title
Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0344
Title
Workforce Development - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0377)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0796)
Title
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880
Title
Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB1190)
Title
Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - Study
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 /CH0002 (HB1106/CH0001)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0377 (SB0513) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0685 Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0759 Home Act of 2016 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0801) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1007 /CH0287 Freedom to Vote Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Delegate Frick 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 (SB0894) Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload Analysis Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0344 Workforce Development - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0513 (HB0377) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0546 Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0796) Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0880 Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0894 (HB1190) Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - Study Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0921 /CH0002 (HB1106/CH0001) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Senator Pugh 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1014 Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM