Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0596
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 (SB0549)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757 (SB0938)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758 (SB0937)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Willards Lions Club
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552 /CH0110
Title
Wicomico County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salaries
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 (HB0752)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 (HB0758)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Willards Lions Club
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938 (HB0757)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0356 /CH0596 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 (SB0549) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0757 (SB0938) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0758 (SB0937) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Willards Lions Club Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1506 /CH0459 Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 /CH0110 Wicomico County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salaries Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Judiciary
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0549 (HB0752) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0937 (HB0758) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Willards Lions Club Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0938 (HB0757) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM