Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0855)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020 (SB0799)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 /CH0294
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040 (SB0730)
Title
Wicomico County - Board of Education
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0471 (SB0821)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1040)
Title
Wicomico County - Board of Education
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB1020)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1182/CH0471)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0841)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 (SB0855) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1020 (SB0799) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB1039 /CH0294 Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1040 (SB0730) Wicomico County - Board of Education Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1182 /CH0471 (SB0821) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB1040) Wicomico County - Board of Education Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0798 Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit Senator Mathias 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0799 (HB1020) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Council Multi-Purpose Center Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 (HB1182/CH0471) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
SB0855 (HB0841) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM