Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0747)
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0729)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521 (SB1140/CH0242)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1576 (SB1151)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Habitat for Humanity of Wicomico County
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1612 (SB1042)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 /CH0169
Title
Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1143)
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0526)
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB1612)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1140 /CH0242 (HB1521)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1151 (HB1576)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Habitat for Humanity of Wicomico County
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0526 (SB0747) Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0729) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1359 Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1521 (SB1140/CH0242) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1576 (SB1151) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Habitat for Humanity of Wicomico County Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1612 (SB1042) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0145 /CH0169 Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 (HB1143) Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0729 (HB1097) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0738 Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0747 (HB0526) Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB1042 (HB1612) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
SB1061 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
SB1140 /CH0242 (HB1521) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1151 (HB1576) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Habitat for Humanity of Wicomico County Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM