Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 /CH0449 (SB0523)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0855)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0846)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0144
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Licenses - Clubs
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 (HB0689/CH0449)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 (HB1156)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0841)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0689 /CH0449 (SB0523) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Delegate Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0841 (SB0855) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1156 (SB0846) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0038 /CH0144 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Licenses - Clubs Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 (HB0689/CH0449) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Senator Mathias 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0846 (HB1156) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 (HB0841) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM