Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 (SB0991)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 (SB0843)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Believe in Tomorrow Cottage By the Sea
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0804)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Believe in Tomorrow Cottage By the Sea
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0801)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1053
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Lower Eastern Shore Conservation and Heritage Center
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0801 (SB0991) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3 Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB0804 (SB0843) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Believe in Tomorrow Cottage By the Sea Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091) Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 (HB0804) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Believe in Tomorrow Cottage By the Sea Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0991 (HB0801) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3 Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB1053 Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Lower Eastern Shore Conservation and Heritage Center Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM