Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Zoning and Planning

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
State Development Plan - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 /CH0393
Title
Transportation - Metropolitan Planning Organizations - Notice and Public Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 (SB0497)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 4500 Harford Road Development Project
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0601
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
Calvert County - Zoning - Target Ranges
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0466
Title
Garrett County - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems - Setback Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0474)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 4500 Harford Road Development Project
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706 (HB1210)
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0074 State Development Plan - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0288 /CH0393 Transportation - Metropolitan Planning Organizations - Notice and Public Hearing Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0474 (SB0497) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 4500 Harford Road Development Project Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
HB0510 /CH0601 Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1037 Calvert County - Zoning - Target Ranges Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 /CH0466 Garrett County - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems - Setback Requirement Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Senator Colburn 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 (HB0474) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 4500 Harford Road Development Project Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0706 (HB1210) Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM