Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/19/2021 9:42:40 PM
Wednesday, January 6, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 12/30/2020 9:14 AM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
- Briefing regarding the Juvenile Justice Reform Council from the Maryland Department of Juvenile Services

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 9/2/2020 2:22 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 11/25/2020 11:54 AM
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 923 7424 2796
Passcode: 437448
Phone: 301-715-8592
Meeting of Full Authority + Hearings