Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/28/2020 3:10:20 PM
Friday, February 14, 2020
House
Created: 1/24/2020 10:06 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Chr W&M (Dept)

Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Del Cain, et al

Education - Certification in Secondary Education Content Areas - Expanded Grade Range
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Valentino-Smith, et al

Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Dels Walker and Anderton

Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Cain, et al

Public Schools - Staff Members - Report
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Patterson, et al

Education - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Workgroup Extension
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Stein

Career and Technology Education - Training in Soft Business Skills
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Cox, et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel (First Responders Tax Benefit Act)
(Added - 1/28/2020 11:27 AM)
Dels Lisanti and P. Young

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement Income (Defense Workforce Opportunity Act)
(Removed - 2/5/2020 4:32 PM)