Day(s)
As of: 3/28/2024 8:12:49 AM
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Insurance Administration
(Removed - 2/3/2020 2:51 PM)
Created: 2/5/2020 9:07 AM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/29/2020 3:11 PM
12:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the floor session.
Charles County Senators
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sens West and Waldstreicher
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
(Added - 1/31/2020 2:26 PM)
Created: 2/14/2020 10:49 AM
Rules Committee - Bill Hearing
12:00 PM - State House Caucus Room, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD 21401
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
OLA Special Review-Opioid Operational Command Center Audit
(Added - 2/12/2020 1:10 PM)
Created: 1/24/2020 10:06 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
The Spkr (Admin), et al
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Del Cain, et al
Education - Certification in Secondary Education Content Areas - Expanded Grade Range
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Valentino-Smith, et al
Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Dels Walker and Anderton
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Patterson, et al
Education - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Workgroup Extension
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Cox, et al
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel (First Responders Tax Benefit Act)
(Added - 1/28/2020 11:27 AM)
Dels Lisanti and P. Young
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement Income
(Defense Workforce Opportunity Act)
(Removed - 2/5/2020 4:32 PM)
Dels Branch and Smith
Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Del Clippinger, et al
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Distance Restrictions, Extension Fee, and Class D License
Del Smith, et al
Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Exchange of Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Del Wells, et al
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System
Boy Scouts of America
Baltimore County Office of Tourism
BW Tech
Maryland Tech Council
Del Metzgar, et al
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
Dels Szeliga and Arikan
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
Del Long
Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program
Del Grammer
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Coffee