Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/13/2021 1:52:04 PM
Wednesday, April 7, 2021
House
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 4/5/2021 5:40 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- SB 106, SB 326, SB 353, SB 360, SB 649, SB 689 and SB 697
(Added - 4/6/2021 9:47 AM)
- SB 106, SB 326, SB 360, SB 649, SB 689 and SB 697
(Removed - 4/6/2021 9:47 AM)

Created: 4/7/2021 5:29 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
5:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page