Day(s)
As of: 3/18/2024 9:36:14 PM
Created: 5/11/2020 11:15 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Department of Human Services regarding SNAP benefits
Created: 4/29/2020 7:19 AM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM
-
Conference Call
11:15 AM to 12:30 PM - Conference Call
To watch click on livestream, and click on "Youtube Live Stream" under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business and to approve 100% Capital Improvement Program allocations.
Created: 4/23/2020 3:45 PM
9:00 AM
-
Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
9:00 AM - Conference Call
Conference Call-in Number: 1-855-797-9480 (U.S. Toll Free)
(Added - 5/12/2020 8:41 AM)
Access Code: 612 767 457
(Added - 5/12/2020 8:41 AM)
Monthly Meeting