Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 7/8/2020 4:49:26 AM
Thursday, June 25, 2020
Senate
Created: 6/12/2020 8:32 AM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Briefing
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on COVID-19 Impacts to Services for Vulnerable Populations

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 6/9/2020 9:21 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
To join by phone: US Toll +415-655-0001
Access Code: 161 313 4914
To join by WebEx: https://mdhealth.webex.com/mdhealth/k2/j.php?MTID=tf03d7ad9f8a39c9de34d1634aefe010d
(Added - 6/9/2020 9:32 AM)
Session number: 161 313 4914
(Added - 6/9/2020 9:32 AM)
Session password: vcQNJFjx692
(Added - 6/9/2020 9:32 AM)

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 6/17/2020 4:54 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - Conference Call
General Meeting of the Oversight Committee
Call-In Phone Number: +1-561-408-9176
(Added - 6/24/2020 12:40 PM)
PIN: 790 374 430#
Call-In Phone Number: +561-408-9176
(Removed - 6/24/2020 12:40 PM)

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 6/10/2020 7:39 AM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Conference Call
To watch click on Livestream , and click on "Youtube Live Stream" under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business