Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/25/2020 3:10:29 PM
Monday, September 28, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Created: 8/28/2020 1:32 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Please see the Commission webpage for the agenda and meeting updates. To view the meeting click here
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
(Added - 8/31/2020 8:44 AM)
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.
(Removed - 9/24/2020 5:17 PM)