Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/6/2020 6:49:13 AM
Thursday, August 6, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 8/3/2020 11:17 AM
Education Subcommittee - Briefing
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 7/22/2020 10:22 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
On-line Council meeting.
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.

Police Reform and Accountability in Maryland, Workgroup to Address
Created: 7/21/2020 4:08 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Material
Meeting Video
All slots available for registration have been filled.  If you'd like to upload a video testimonial, you may do so at:
https://script.google.com/macros/s/AKfycbxpQEuXbwMFwVu7wJCQpGfuVVbTfD2IRVuzq6YL3Cv0XVHSknLM/exec
Please note that your video may be uploaded to the MGA website for viewing by the public.
Public testimony on police reform and accountability