Update Report
As of: 3/28/2024 3:51:07 PM
Change made: March 28, 2024 11:20 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2024 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2024 2:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2024 9:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB1187
Sens Simonaire and Salling
State of Emergency – Restoration, Repair, or Replacement of Critical Infrastructure – Suspension of State or Local Law
Change made: March 28, 2024 11:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2024 9:00 AM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2024 10:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2024 11:00 AM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 28, 2024 11:02 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
April 2, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0596
Dorchester County Delegation
Dorchester County - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
ADDED: 11:02 AM
SB0810
Sen Mautz
Dorchester County - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
ADDED: 11:02 AM
Change made: March 28, 2024 11:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 29, 2024 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 1188 and 1271
SBs 818 and 982
Change made: March 28, 2024 1:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
April 3, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SBs 194, 280, 290, 292, 1007, and 1014
Change made: March 28, 2024 12:05 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2024 12:10 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 28, 2024 2:00 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: March 28, 2024 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0181
Del Hill, et al
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Prohibition on Rent Increases and Shielding of Court Records
HB0656
Del Ivey
Family Law - Victims of Domestic Violence Program - Certification and Grant Fund
HB0734
Del Mireku-North, et al
Municipalities - Vagrancy - Repeal of Authority to Prohibit
SB0019
Sen Sydnor
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
SB0354
Sens Waldstreicher and Jackson
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
SB0391
Sen Kelly, et al
Criminal Law - Sexual Extortion, Stalking, and Revenge Porn - Statute of Limitations and In Banc Review
SB0439
Sen Elfreth, et al
Family Law - Victims of Domestic Violence Program - Certification and Grant Fund
SB0470
The Pres (Admin), et al
Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
SB0475
The Pres (Admin), et al
Center for Firearm Violence Prevention - Establishment
SB0480
The Pres (Admin), et al
Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
SB0549
Sen Sydnor
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis and Search - Applicability for Deceased and Missing Individuals
SB0550
Sen Sydnor
Children - Labor Trafficking
SB0575
Sen Corderman (Md Jud Conf), et al
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Change made: March 28, 2024 12:44 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 28, 2024 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 28, 2024 1:00 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: March 28, 2024 2:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
SB0011
Sen Carter
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and Maryland Judiciary - Information Technology- Partial Expungement
SB0065
Sen James, et al
Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Prohibitions and Penalties
SB0123
Sen Carter
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence
SB0273
Chr JPR (Dept)
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Operation of Unmanned Aircraft - Image Recording and Delivery of Contraband
SB0379
Sen West, et al
Task Force to Study Crime Classification - Renaming, Membership, and Duties
SB0402
Sen McKay
Correctional Training Commission - Membership - Alterations
SB0486
Sens Hayes and M. Washington
Correctional Services – Maryland Correctional Enterprises Management Council – Report
SB0624
Sen Carter
Task Force to Study Public Information Act Requests Made to Law Enforcement – Establishment
SB0687
Sen Smith (Md Jud Conf)
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Seventh Judicial Circuit
SB0894
Sen Carter
Baltimore City - Control Over Powers of Police Commissioner
SB1095
Sens Smith and Elfreth
Workgroup on Home Detention Monitoring
SB1098
Sen Smith
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses
SB0607
Sen Folden, et al
Public Safety - Police Accountability and Discipline - Summary Punishment
REMOVED: 12:12 PM
ADDED: 12:44 PM
SB0608
Sen Folden, et al
Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
REMOVED: 12:12 PM
ADDED: 12:44 PM
Change made: March 28, 2024 11:42 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 28, 2024 12:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 28, 2024 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
SB0394
Sen Hester, et al
Catalytic Revitalization Project Tax Credit - Alterations
SB0897
Sen Carozza, et al
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Death Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers and Fire Fighters
SB1066
Sens Zucker and Ferguson
Sports Wagering - Independent Evaluation of Sports Wagering Content - Required
SB0014
Sen Jackson
Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
SB0781
Sen James
Economic Development - Regional Additive Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland - Alterations
SB0822
Sen Kramer, et al
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
SB0675
The Pres (Office of the Comptroller)
Individual Tax Preparers - Code of Ethics, Notification of Actions, Enforcement, and Penalties (Stop Scam Tax Preparers Act)
SB0765
Sen Hayes
Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established
SB0878
Sen Klausmeier
Gaming – Problem Gambling – Prevalence Study and Fund Revenue
SB0473
The Pres (Admin), et al
Economic Development - Entrepreneurial Innovation Programs - Establishment (Pava LaPere Legacy of Innovation Act of 2024)
SB0516
Sen A. Washington
Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
SB0784
Sen Elfreth, et al
Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act
SB1005
Sen Hayes
Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
SB1076
Sen Corderman
Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund
SB1105
The Pres (Office of the Comptroller)
Income Tax - Individual Income Tax Credit Eligibility Awareness Campaign
Change made: March 28, 2024 12:28 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Baltimore County - Other
March 29, 2024 8:30 AM
(Previous Date/Time: March 29, 2024 9:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearings - None
Bill Voting - SB450, SB1010, SB1067
Briefing - Director Bob Smith, Department of Recreation and Parks