Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/21/2020 10:26:33 PM
Monday, September 21, 2020
Monday, September 21, 2020
House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: September 21, 2020 1:59 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
September 23, 2020 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
<br> 2) Utility Moratorium: Arrearage Management, Budget Billing, and Public Assistance
REMOVED: 1:59 PM
1) Natural Gas Infrastructure in Baltimore City: Labyrinth Road update; STRIDE and Pipeline Maintenance
2) Utility Moratorium: Arrearage Management, Budget Billing, and Public Assistance
ADDED: 1:59 PM

Other
Capital Debt Affordability Committee
Change made: September 21, 2020 4:46 PM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 8, 2020 1:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
Legislative review, revenue estimates, and the review of capital programs

Change made: September 21, 2020 4:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 14, 2020 10:00 AM
On-Line Meeting
Review of tax supported debt and the size and condition of debt of higher education institutions.

Change made: September 21, 2020 4:50 PM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 19, 2020 1:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
Recommendation of general obligation bond authorizations.

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Change made: September 21, 2020 12:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on - Other
November 5, 2020 1:00 PM to November 5, 2020 3:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
Dial in Phone #: +1-413-853-2349
PIN: 463 745 573#
General Meeting

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: September 21, 2020 10:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
October 15, 2020 9:00 AM to October 15, 2020 12:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.