Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 2/25/2021 8:47:00 PM
Thursday, February 25, 2021
Thursday, February 25, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 1:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
February 26, 2021 10:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0119
Sens Guzzone and Elfreth

Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
ADDED: 1:53 PM
SB0376
Sen Kagan

Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
ADDED: 1:53 PM
SB0414
Sen Pinsky, et al

Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
ADDED: 1:53 PM
SB0630
Sen Ferguson

Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
ADDED: 1:53 PM
SB0779
Sen Elfreth, et al

Maryland 529 Program – Board Authority and State Contribution – Alterations
ADDED: 1:53 PM

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 2:27 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
February 26, 2021 9:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0010
Sens Waldstreicher and Ferguson

Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
SB0066
Sen Elfreth, et al

Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
SB0077
Sen Griffith

Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
SB0093
Sen Griffith

Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
SB0283
Sen Elfreth

Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
SB0324
Sens Elfreth and Bailey

Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
SB0418
Sen Pinsky, et al

Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations
SB0427
Sens Elfreth and West

Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
SB0442
Sen Klausmeier

Aquaculture Leases and Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands
SB0448
Sen Edwards

County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
SB0476
Sen Eckardt

Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
SB0509
Sen Peters

National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
SB0564
Sen Griffith

Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
SB0596
Sen Washington

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
SB0697
Sen Eckardt

State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
SB0703
Sen West

Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises – Qualification and Certification

Change made: February 25, 2021 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 10, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0633
Sen Carozza

Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
REMOVED: 10:51 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 5:16 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 2, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0814
Sen Klausmeier (Chr Jt Com on UIO)

Unemployment Insurance – Earned Rating Record – Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID–19
REMOVED: 5:16 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 7:46 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
February 25, 2021 9:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 25, 2021 3:00 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 25, 2021 5:30 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 25, 2021 6:30 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 25, 2021 7:30 PM)
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0626
Sen Carter

Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force

House
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee
Change made: February 25, 2021 11:40 AM - HEARING ADDED
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee - Work Session
March 1, 2021 11:00 AM to March 1, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 7:26 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 9, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1336
Del Proctor

Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Executive Director – Clarification
ADDED: 7:26 PM
HB1341
Chr APP (Dept)

University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
ADDED: 7:26 PM

Change made: February 25, 2021 7:27 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 16, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1043
Del Rosenberg

Local Health Services – Funding and Infrastructure
ADDED: 7:27 PM
HB1159
Del Thiam

Higher Education – Community College Credits – General Education Courses
ADDED: 7:27 PM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 11:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0971
Del Mautz

Talbot County Speed Monitoring Systems
ADDED: 11:08 AM
HB1204
Del Ruth

Equity in Transportation Sector – Guidelines and Analyses (Transportation Equity Analyses and Assurances Act of 2021)
ADDED: 11:08 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 12:32 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 3, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0948
Del Wells

Maryland Office of the Inspector General – Establishment
REMOVED: 10:54 AM
HB0788
Del Krimm

Procurement Officers - Hiring Practices and Certification
REMOVED: 12:32 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 12:05 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 25, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0068
Del T. Branch

Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
REMOVED: 12:05 PM

Sports Wagering Workgroup
Change made: February 25, 2021 3:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
Sports Wagering Workgroup - Other
March 1, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Workgroup regarding HB940

Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee
Change made: February 25, 2021 11:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee - Work Session
February 26, 2021 12:00 PM to February 26, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 25, 2021 6:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
February 26, 2021 9:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0655
Del Crosby

Local Government – County Commissioner Elections – District Voting

Change made: February 25, 2021 4:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0010
Del K. Young

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
HB0421
Del Rosenberg

Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
HB0539
Del Buckel

Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions
HB0656
Del Crosby

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Accessibility by Public Transportation
HB0711
Del D. Jones

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
HB0815
Del Shoemaker

State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
HB0853
Chr W&M (Dept)

Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
HB0888
Del McKay

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members – Active Status Points
HB1048
Del Wilkins

Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
HB1137
Del Kerr

Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency

Other
Baltimore City
Change made: February 25, 2021 11:36 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Baltimore City - Other
February 26, 2021 8:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Special Guest: U.S. Senator Ben Cardin
ADDED: 11:36 AM

Change made: February 25, 2021 11:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Other
March 1, 2021 5:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Local Bill Hearings and Voting Session

Baltimore County
Change made: February 25, 2021 12:30 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Baltimore County - Other
February 26, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Local Bill Hearing: HB895, HB913, HB1094, HB1197
REMOVED: 12:30 PM
Voting Session
REMOVED: 12:30 PM
Voting Session: HB45, HB1141
ADDED: 12:30 PM
Local Bill Hearing: HB895, HB1094
ADDED: 12:30 PM
Briefing by the Baltimore County Executive
ADDED: 12:30 PM

Charles
Change made: February 25, 2021 12:35 PM - HEARING ADDED
Charles - Other
March 5, 2021 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Legislative Updates

Harford
Change made: February 25, 2021 11:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
March 4, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Harford County House Delegation Meeting

Southern Maryland
Change made: February 25, 2021 12:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
March 5, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page