Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 600

File Code: Taxes - Income Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 580
Sponsored By:
Delegates Zucker, Anderson, Barve, Branch, Clippinger, Glass, Haynes, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Myers, Niemann, Ready, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Ross, Serafini, Stukes, Vaughn, Walker, Washington, Cardin, and F. Turner
Entitled:
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief

Synopsis:

Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the discharge of indebtedness related to acquiring, constructing, substantially improving, or refinancing a principal residence; providing that the subtraction does not apply to more than a specified amount for specified individuals; providing for an addition modification to the State income tax under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
2/6
First Reading Ways and Means
2/8
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21

Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20
Favorable with Amendments {825667/1 Report Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment {345468/1 Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/21
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
4/1
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/28
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/27
Favorable with Amendments {689734/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/28
Floor Amendment (Senator Peters) {723628/1 Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 545

Sponsored by:

Delegate Craig J. Zucker, District 14
Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Kumar P. Barve, District 17
Delegate Talmadge Branch, District 45
Delegate Jon S. Cardin, District 11
Delegate Luke Clippinger, District 46
Delegate Glen Glass, District 34A
Delegate Keith E. Haynes, District 44
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate Jolene Ivey, District 47
Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate Eric G. Luedtke, District 14
Delegate Maggie McIntosh, District 43
Delegate Aruna Miller, District 15
Delegate Keiffer J. Mitchell, Jr., District 44
Delegate LeRoy E. Myers, Jr., District 1C
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Justin Ready, District 5A
Delegate Shane Robinson, District 39
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Andrew A. Serafini, District 2A
Delegate Melvin L. Stukes, District 44
Delegate Frank S. Turner, District 13
Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24
Delegate Jay Walker, District 26
Delegate Mary L. Washington, District 43

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Exemptions
Income Tax
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Mortgages
Real Property
Sunset

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Tax - General
( 10-205 , 10-205 , 10-207 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 345468/01     Offered on: March 23, 2012   at: 4:03 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 825667/01     Offered on: March 23, 2012   at: 4:01 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 689734/01     Offered on: April 2, 2012   at: 10:02 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 723628/01     Offered on: April 3, 2012   at: 11:46 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Ways and Means
Senate
Budget and Taxation
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 21, 2012: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
April 1, 2012: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Senate
March 28, 2012: Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)