Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2012 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 553

File Code: Bi-County Agencies Prior Year Introduction As: SB 438/11 - EHE
Sponsored By:
Senator Rosapepe
Entitled:
Maryland-Washington Metropolitan District and Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel

Synopsis:

Altering a provision of law to provide that the boundaries of the Maryland-Washington Metropolitan District do not include specified property annexed by the City of Laurel from July 2, 1997 to July 1, 2012, both inclusive; altering a provision of law to provide that the boundaries of the Maryland-Washington Regional District include all of Prince George's County except the City of Laurel as its boundaries are defined as of July 1, 2008, and specified property annexed by the City from July 2, 2008, to July 1, 2012, inclusive; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
Senate Action
2/3
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/8
Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4

Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/29
Favorable with Amendments {574431/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
House Action
3/31
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Boundaries
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Prince George's County

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Article - 28 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
( 3-102 , 7-103 )
Land Use
( 19-102 , 20-101 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 574431/01     Offered on: April 4, 2012   at: 11:34 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Vote (Legislative date is shown):
Senate
March 30, 2012: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Click to return on the top page