Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


Senate Agenda for Proceedings No. 32

Proceedings
FEBRUARY 25, 2013 - Session 1
INTRODUCTORY SENATE BILLS # 45Completed
MSG FROM THE HOUSE: FIRST RDG HOUSE BILLS # 6Completed
BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE REPORT NO. 13-006Completed
FINANCE COMMITTEE REPORT NO. 13-009Completed
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS COMMITTEE REPORT NO. 13-007Completed
LAID OVER CALENDAR # 20Completed
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR # 21Completed
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR # 22Completed
SEN. 3RD RDG CAL NO. 19 (GEN. SB)Completed
SEN. 3RD RDG CAL NO. 20 (GEN. SB)Completed




SENATE OF MARYLAND
FEBRUARY 25, 2013
48TH DAY OF SESSION
INTRODUCTORY SENATE BILLS NO. 45
SB 1023 Sen. Pinsky Creatn of a St Dbt - PG Co - PG Arts and Humanities Coun Creatv Bsns Incubator SRU
SB 1024 Sen. Shank Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination SRU
SB 1025 Sen. Garagiola Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Potomac Community Resources Home SRU
SB 1026 Sen. Colburn Honey - License Exemptions SRU
SB 1027 Sen. Forehand Creatn of a St Dbt - Mont Co - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre Relocation and Expansion SRU


SENATE OF MARYLAND
FEBRUARY 25, 2013
48TH DAY OF SESSION
MESSAGE FROM THE HOUSE OF DELEGATES NO. 6
FIRST READING HOUSE BILLS
HB 1 Del. K. Kelly Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition JPR
HB 70 Del. Carr State Government - Access to Public Records in Electronic Formats - Termination Date EHE
HB 99 Del. Hubbard Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals (TCEP) - Prohibition FIN
HB 103 Del. Morhaim School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development Documents B&T
HB 206 The Speaker Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation EHE
HB 226 The Speaker Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 FIN
HB 262 Del. Haddaway-Riccio Crim Law - Distrib of Faked Controlled Dangerous Substance - Substantially Similar Chemical Struc JPR
HB 312 Del. Pena-Melnyk Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification FIN
HB 346 Harford County Del. Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights JPR
HB 359 Ch. Hlth & Govt Ops Militia - Maryland Defense Force - Enlistment Period EHE
HB 425
(Emergency Bill)
Del. Nathan-Pulliam St Bd of Nursing - Medication Technician Graduates and Certd Medication Technicians - Sunset Ext EHE
HB 494 Del. Griffith State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service B&T


REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON BUDGET AND TAXATION
Distribution Date: FEBRUARY 25, 2013
Second Reading Date: FEBRUARY 25, 2013
Report Number: 13-006

Favorable Report
SB 318 FAV Sens Brinkley and Young Frederick County - Property Tax Credit to Offset Income Tax Revenues - Eligibility
SB 429 FAV Carroll County Senators Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds
SB 470 FWA(3) Sen Mathias Employees' Pension System - Somerset Co Econ Dev Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit
SB 751 FAV Sen Robey State Police Retirement System - Reemployment of Retirees
SB 801 FWA(2) Sen Jones-Rodwell (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns) State Ret and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and Clarif


REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON FINANCE
Distribution Date: FEBRUARY 21, 2013
Second Reading Date: FEBRUARY 22, 2013
Report Number: 13-009

Favorable Report
SB 234 FAV Sen Currie, et al Office of the Attorney General - Est of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's Co
SB 375 FWA(1) Sen Middleton Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - Scope
SB 384 FWA(1) Sen Pugh, et al Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program
SB 446 FWA(2) Sen Pugh, et al Homeowner's or Renter's Ins and Private Psgr Motor Vehicle Ins - Bundling Reqmt - Prohibited
SB 589 FWA(1) Sen Pugh, et al Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions
SB 745 FWA(2) Sen Middleton Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone Systems - Prepaid Service - Collection of Surcharge

Unfavorable Report
SB 329 UNF Sen Gladden State Personnel - Hiring Preferences for Graduates of Public Institutions of Higher Education


REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS
Distribution Date: FEBRUARY 25, 2013
Second Reading Date: FEBRUARY 25, 2013
Report Number: 13-007

Favorable Report
SB 276 FWA(3) The Pres (Admin), et al Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide Victims
SB 281 FWA(20) The Pres (Admin), et al Firearm Safety Act of 2013


FEBRUARY 25, 2013
48TH DAY OF SESSION
LAID OVER BILLS NO. 20
SB 384 Sen. Pugh Economic Development - Sickle Cell
Disease Research Program. 02/22/13
Reported Favorably with Amendment (1)
by the Committee on Finance and Laid
Over under the Rule.
QUESTION IS ON THE ADOPTION OF THE COMMITTEE AMENDMENT (1)
AND THE FAVORABLE REPORT.


FEBRUARY 25, 2013
48TH DAY OF SESSION
SPECIAL ORDERS NO. 21
SB 182 Sen. Brochin Md Transit Admin - Activation of Audio
Recording Dvcs on Vehicles Used for
Transit Serv - Prohib. 02/19/13
Reported Favorably with Amendments (2)
by the Committee on Judicial
Proceedings and Laid Over under the
Rule. 02/20/13 Made a Special Order
for 02/25/13.
QUESTION IS ON THE ADOPTION OF THE COMMITTEE AMENDMENTS (2)
AND THE FAVORABLE REPORT.


FEBRUARY 25, 2013
48TH DAY OF SESSION
SPECIAL ORDERS NO. 22
EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS 02/21/13 Report of the Committee on
REPORT NO. 4 Executive Nominations. Motion to
Nominee No. 29 consider separately Nominee No. 29
(John P. Coale) Adopted. Consideration
of Nominee No. 29 (John P. Coale to the
Maryland Stadium Authority).
QUESTION IS: "WILL THE SENATE ADVISE AND CONSENT
TO THE NOMINATION OF THE EXECUTIVE?"


SENATE OF MARYLAND
DIST DATE: FEB 21, 2013
THIRD RDG: FEB 22, 2013
SENATE THIRD READING CALENDAR NO. 19
PUBLIC GENERAL LAWS AND RESOLUTIONS (SENATE BILLS)
SB 130 Sen. Glassman Harford County - Charitable Gaming B&T
SB 158
(Emergency Bill)
Sen. Conway Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and Application B&T
SB 164 Sen. Pipkin Queen Anne's County - Property Tax Credit - Commercial Investment and Economic Development B&T
SB 183
(Emergency Bill)
Ch., Budget & Tax Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit B&T
SB 243 Sen. Astle Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - Extension B&T
SB 245 Sen. Robey School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development Documents B&T
SB 315 Sen. Brinkley Frederick County - Gaming Permits B&T
SB 321 Sen. Brinkley Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees EHE
SB 369 Sen. Edwards Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital B&T
SB 404 Sen. Middleton Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment B&T
SB 430 Carroll Co. Senators Carroll County - Gaming B&T


SENATE OF MARYLAND
DIST DATE: FEB 22, 2013
THIRD RDG: FEB 25, 2013
SENATE THIRD READING CALENDAR NO. 20
PUBLIC GENERAL LAWS AND RESOLUTIONS (SENATE BILLS)
SB 67 Ch., Budget & Tax Central Collection Unit - Montrg and Recording of Tel Calls - Training and Qlty Ctrl Purposes B&T
SB 179 Chair, EHE Com. Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits EHE
SB 272 Sen. Currie State Lottery Agency - Tickets - Electronic Devices Connected to the Internet B&T
SB 282
(Emergency Bill)
Sen. Jones-Rodwell Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling B&T
SB 371 Sen. Edwards Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales EHE
SJ 1 Sen. Jones-Rodwell International Education - Support EHE

Top