Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


Senate Agenda for Proceedings No. 40

Proceedings
MARCH 11, 2015 - SESSION 1
March 11, 2015
57th Day of Session
Message from the House: Introductory House Bills No. 10
HB 130
Delegate Jones
Budget and Taxation
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
HB 360
Delegate Vallario
Judicial Proceedings
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Top
March 11, 2015
57th Day of Session
Laid Over Calendar No. 16
SB 398

Senator Pugh
Public Service Commission - Community Solar Projects or Virtual Net Energy Metering - Study

03/10/15 Reported Favorably with Amendments (2) by the Committee on Finance and Laid Over under the Rule.
QUESTION IS ON THE ADOPTION OF THE COMMITTEE AMENDMENTS (2) AND THE FAVORABLE REPORT.
SB 526

Senator Raskin
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015

03/10/15 Reported Favorably with Amendments (6) by the Committee on Judicial Proceedings and Laid Over under the Rule.
QUESTION IS ON THE ADOPTION OF THE COMMITTEE AMENDMENTS (6) AND THE FAVORABLE REPORT.
Top
Judicial Proceedings Committee Report No. 8
Distribution Date: March 9, 2015
Second Reading Date: March 10, 2015
FAVORABLE
SB 146
Favorable Senator Zirkin
Prelitigation Discovery - Insurance Coverage - Prerequisites for Disclosure
SB 217
Favorable Senator Kelley
Special or Supplemental Needs Trusts - Authorization to Fund
SB 315
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Ramirez
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order
SB 525
Favorable Senator Raskin
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
SB 604
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator King
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for Interns
SB 685
Favorable with Amendments (4) Senator Benson
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 323
Unfavorable Senator Bates
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
SB 570
Unfavorable Senator Kelley
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
SB 653
Unfavorable Senator Muse
Criminal Procedure - Police-Involved Death - State Prosecutor
UNFAVORABLE
SB 571
Unfavorable Senator Kelley
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Top
Distribution Date: March 10, 2015
Third Reading Date: March 11, 2015
Senate Third Reading Calendar No. 25 (General Senate Bills)
SB 226
Senator Reilly
Budget and Taxation
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
SB 286
Senator Manno
Budget and Taxation
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership
SB 364
Senator Kasemeyer
Budget and Taxation
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
SB 432
Senator Peters
Budget and Taxation
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Combination of Service - Clarification
SB 443
Senator Norman
Budget and Taxation
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
SB 451
Senator Guzzone
Budget and Taxation
Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles
SB 694
Senator Manno
Budget and Taxation
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Transfer of Credit
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 12, 2015 6:0 AM