Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Special Registration Plates - Confederate Battle Flag
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Beidle, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Lam, McCray, Moon, Stein, Carr, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Knotts, S. Robinson, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from authorizing the display of an emblem or a logo that depicts the Confederate battle flag on special registration plates or a special registration plate; prohibiting the Administration from renewing the registration of a motor vehicle that displays an emblem or a logo that depicts the Confederate battle flag on its special registration plates or plate until the special registration plates or plate is returned to the Administration in exchange for substitute registration plates; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
6/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {950517/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 6/24/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/14/2016 1/14/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {950517/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-502.1, 13-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM