Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Arora
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring individuals who are convicted of specified alcohol-related driving offenses involving transportation of a minor to successfully complete the Ignition Interlock System Program.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 9/04/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-404.1, 21-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM