Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Hettleman, Bhandari, Carr, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Johnson, Jones, Kelly, Kerr, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Rosenberg, Shetty, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Washington, Wells, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the establishment of an Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program by a community-based organization to provide a place for the consumption of preobtained drugs, provide sterile needles, administer first aid, and provide certain other services; providing the Maryland Department of Health may approve no more than 6 programs to operate in a single location in an area of high incidence drug use; requiring each program to submit a certain report to certain legislative committees by December 1 of each year; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1601 through 24-1606 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM