Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Board of Elections)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain provision of law requiring a campaign finance entity to terminate and file a final campaign finance report applies; altering the time period within which a certain campaign finance entity is required to terminate and file a final campaign finance report; requiring the State Board of Elections to provide a certain notification to certain persons affiliated with a campaign finance entity that is required to terminate under a certain provision of law; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 31
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-310, 13-313 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM