Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the Howard County transfer tax the sale of residential real property to certain teachers if the teacher is a first-time home buyer in Howard County; establishing a maximum transfer tax rate of 0.7% in Howard County for the sale of residential real property to certain teachers under certain circumstances; providing for the recapture of the transfer tax exempted or reduced under the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {775868/1
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {775868/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {775868/1 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Walker) Adopted 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {775868/1 Adopted 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 38
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20.300 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM