Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, B. Robinson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the court, in any case in which the court determines child support, if there is no court order awarding custody and visitation of the child, to advise the parties of the resources available to assist them in establishing custody and visitation; and requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration, when it has established a child support obligation and there is no court order awarding custody and visitation of the child, to advise the parties of the resources available to assist them in establishing custody and visitation.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1192 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {362910/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM