Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Residency Requirement - Determination of In-State Tuition Status
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public institution of higher education to determine that a student meets the residency requirement if the student provides evidence to the institution that the student graduated from a secondary school in the State or received the equivalent of a high school diploma in the State, resides at an address in the State, and possesses a Social Security number; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Residency Requirement - Determination of In-State Tuition Status
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.10, 15-106.2, 15-106.8, 15-106.9 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:33 AM