Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, Arentz, McComas, Myers, and Norman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Plumbing to adopt standards of the International Code Council as part of the State Plumbing Code; requiring the Board to periodically review specified standards of the International Code Council; requiring the Board to amend the State Plumbing Code to incorporate specified standards for a water conserving appliance, device, fitting, or fixture under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0247 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM