Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Sponsored by
Delegates Lopez, Acevero, Attar, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Bartlett, Boyce, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, W. Fisher, Forbes, Grammer, Guyton, Henson, Hettleman, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to require entrance-level and in-service police training conducted by the State and each county and municipal police training school to include in their curriculum training relating to the criminal laws concerning recognition of, reporting of, and response to hate crimes.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0633
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0699 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM