Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the members of the Board of Community College Trustees for Anne Arundel County to reside in Anne Arundel County; establishing a 4-year term for nonstudent members; and limiting nonstudent members to three consecutive full terms; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0031
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494066/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {494066/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:02 AM