Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Bohanan, Busch, Cardin, Clagett, Conway, Gaines, Griffith, Guzzone, Healey, Hixson, Howard, James, Lafferty, McIntosh, Mitchell, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the policy of the State on public-private partnerships; authorizing a reporting agency to establish a public-private partnership and execute an agreement in connection with specified functions, services, or assets; requiring a reporting agency to adopt regulations and establish processes for the development, solicitation, evaluation, award, and delivery of public-private partnerships; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0538
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {980215/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {863323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {623526/1 Rejected (44-93)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-19)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379036/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) {333829/1 Rejected (12-35)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters and Appropriations
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {980215/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 40
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {863323/1 Adopted 41
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {623526/1 Rejected (44-93) 41
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 43
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (119-19) 43
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 42
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {379036/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Peters) Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) {333829/1 Rejected (12-35) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) 61A
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (117-18) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10A-101, 10A-102, 10A-102 through 10A-105, 10A-201 through 10A-204, 10A-301, 10A-401 through 10A-403, 11-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM