Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Fisher, Folden, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring local governments to fully comply with and support federal immigration law; prohibiting local governments from restricting specified individuals from requesting, obtaining, sending, receiving, or maintaining specified immigration information; requiring local governments to implement specified requirements and obligations in a manner that is consistent with federal immigration law and protects civil rights; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Text - First - Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - Prohibition
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-520, 4-509 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:52 PM