Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Anderson, Korman, Proctor, Queen, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to adopt a specified set of standards for the training and deployment of SWAT teams and of law enforcement officers not on a SWAT team who conduct no-knock warrant service in the State; and defining "SWAT team" as an agency-designated unit of law enforcement officers who are selected, trained, and equipped to work as a coordinated team to resolve specified critical incidents that may exceed the capabilities of first responders or investigative units.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0941
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0589 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {592516/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (113-26) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-201, 3-207 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:52 PM