Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Builders and Home Improvement Contractors - Contract Requirements - Consumer Protection Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Arikan, Griffith, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a registered home builder or a registered sales representative to include in any initial contract for the initial sale of a new home a copy of the most recent edition of "Buying a New Home: Consumer Rights and Remedies Under Maryland Law"; requiring a contract for the initial sale of a new home to contain a certain acknowledgment that the purchaser received certain consumer protection information; requiring a certain acknowledgment to be independently initialed by the purchaser; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Home Builders and Home Improvement Contractors - Contract Requirements - Consumer Protection Information
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 4:16 PM