Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Beidle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "total purchase price" for the purposes of the vehicle excise tax to exclude from the computation of the tax an allowance for the trade-in of a leased vehicle under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/30/2016 3/30/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-809 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM