Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Branch, Haynes, McIntosh, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain appropriations for certain Baltimore City youth programs; establishing the Law Enforcement Cadet Apprenticeship Program to provide young individuals with the opportunity to begin a career in law enforcement; authorizing the Johns Hopkins University to establish a police department based on a certain memorandum of understanding under certain circumstances; requiring the memorandum of understanding to require that the Baltimore Police Department have certain responsibilities and take certain actions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0793
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Community Safety and Strengthening Act
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 11:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1201 through 24-1209 )
(   8-1201 )
(   3-101, 3-107, 3-201, 3-212 )
(   16-41, 16-42 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM