Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Glenn, Hammen, Pendergrass, Elliott, McIntosh, Hixson, Barve, Branch, Feldman, Tarrant, Barnes, Cane, McHale, Malone, F. Turner, Kach, Clagett, Cluster, Hubbard, Aumann, Lafferty, Frank, Rosenberg, Ivey, Love, Stein, Vaughn, Haynes, Gutierrez, Carr, Cullison, Stukes, Bobo, Cardin, M. Washington, A. Kelly, Reznik, Kramer, Gilchrist, Frush, B. Robinson, Valderrama, Donoghue, Zucker, Weir, Conaway, Carter, Wilson, Glass, Oaks, Luedtke, S. Robinson, Mizeur, Niemann, Summers, A. Miller, Murphy, V. Turner, Nathan-Pulliam, Minnick, Arora, Holmes, Kaiser, Boteler, Smigiel, Braveboy, Hucker, and Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission; providing for the purpose and membership of the Commission; providing for the terms of the members of the Commission; establishing the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Fund; requiring the Commission to issue a specified request for applications at least annually; requiring a specified application submitted by an academic medical center to include specified information; limiting the number of programs the Commission may approve to operate at one time; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {616480/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {846885/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-28)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {616480/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {846885/1 Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Special Order until 3/23 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (108-28) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3101 through 13-3111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM