Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Barkley, Barnes, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harper, Haynes, Hixson, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lee, Morhaim, Oaks, Olszewski, S. Robinson, Zucker, A. Miller, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to assess specified needs, design specified plans, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit a final report of its findings to the Governor, the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {365069/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {643024/3 Rejected (42-85)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-8)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774133/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Delegates A. Washington, Serafini, and Kaiser
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senators Pinsky, Benson, and Jennings
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {365069/3 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {643024/3 Rejected (42-85) 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (127-8) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {774133/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) 58
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Delegates A. Washington, Serafini, and Kaiser 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senators Pinsky, Benson, and Jennings 61
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 64
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
4/01/2014 Amendments Senate - (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {774133/01 Adopted
3/14/2014 Amendments House - (Ways and Means) {365069/03 Adopted
3/15/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate McDonough) {643024/03 Rejected
4/07/2014 Conference Committee Report Senate - {853623/01 Adopted
2/07/2014 Text - First - Common Core State Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup
3/17/2014 Text - Third - Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup
4/08/2014 Text - Enrolled - Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup
4/18/2014 Text - Chapter - Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup
3/14/2014 Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
3/31/2014 Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDonough) {643024/3 Rejected (42-85) - 03/12/14
3/13/2014 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-8) - 03/13/14
4/01/2014 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) - 04/01/14
3/24/2014 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) - 03/24/14
3/30/2014 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) - 03/30/14
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM