Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, on or before January 1, 2019, to require a candidate for a certificate to teach specified students to pass a test of research-based reading instruction; requiring the Board and the State Board of Education jointly to set the passing score for the test, subject to a specified condition; requiring the Board and the State Board jointly to set standards for the delivery of research-based reading instruction by teacher preparation programs in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-704.2, 6-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM