Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Jennings, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering license fees applicants in Baltimore County are required to pay for keeping a billiard table for commercial use, for doing construction business, for keeping a garage where motor vehicles are stored for a fee, for doing the business of cleaning or laundering, for doing business as a plumber or gas fitter, for operating a restaurant, for doing business as a trader, and for operating a chain store.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2015
Legislative Date
1/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/20/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2015 1/20/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2015 1/20/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1103, 17-1504, 17-1604, 17-1808, 17-1809, 17-504, 17-603, 17-803 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM