Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund and establishing a related income tax return checkoff; requiring the Department of State Police to administer the Fund and to adopt certain regulations to implement the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; requiring the Governor for fiscal year 2022 to appropriate $50,000 for the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2019
Legislative Date
9/25/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2019 9/25/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1501 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 9:55 AM