Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Hershey, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Miller, Peters, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law applicable to the registration and authorized use of farm area motor vehicles, including a provision increasing from 10 miles to 25 miles the radius from a farm within which a person may operate on a highway a motor vehicle registered as a farm area motor vehicle; and requiring the owner of a farm area motor vehicle to submit a certain application and documentation for registration of the vehicle.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Senate 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 19A
Text - Third - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 21
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 23
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text - Chapter - Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM